+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor