+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 21, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-719 , Part I.
- Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522.
On August 1, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On June 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Homeland Security
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor