+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On April 8, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Arms Control + Disarm Agcy.
On February 2, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Defense, Arms Control + Disarm Agcy.
On January 26, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
On January 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor