+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On August 1, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Cravaack moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5797 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On July 31, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-634 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 456.
On July 26, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor