+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-504.
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 19, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 12, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
On October 11, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- H.AMDT.852 On agreeing to the Martinez amendment Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.852 Amendment offered by Mr. Martinez. Amendment changed from 18 to 15 months the extension of the statute of limitations for filing age discrimination claims under the Age Discrimination Claims Assistance Act.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Martinez asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Education and Labor discharged.
On October 4, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.852
Amendment changed from 18 to 15 months the extension of the statute of limitations for filing age discrimination claims under the Age Discrimination Claims Assistance Act.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor