+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 16, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-175.
On September 15, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 8, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4519-4520)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 202). (text: 05/16/2022 CR H4997)
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 202).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5082-5083)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Mr. Trone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4997)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5754.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Technology Modernization Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology Modernization.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (121)
Type:
Primary Sponsor