+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5591-5592)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5751.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5591-5593)
- Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 608.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-782.
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (4)
Rob Bishop
Type:
Primary Sponsor