+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 1976 in the House:
- Private Law 94-34.
- Signed by President.
On February 3, 1976 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On February 2, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On February 2, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On January 30, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 94-612.
On November 19, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On November 18, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On November 6, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 94-630.
On April 8, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor