+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
On July 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 21, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5716 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Gordon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 317.
- Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 111-554 , Part I.
On July 14, 2010 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On July 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Science and Technology
- Referred to the Committee on Science and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor