+ − Actions (9)
On September 23, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 22, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 11, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 24, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 14, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 13, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 12, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 10, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On March 3, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor