+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 1982 in the House:
- Clean Bill H.R.6181 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
On April 15, 1982 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Justice, HHS.
On March 25, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 24, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Executive Comment Requested from Admin Office US Courts.
On March 23, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 17, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 16, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 4, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Social Security.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On March 3, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary solely for Consideration of such Provisions of Sections 12 and 13 of the Bill as fall within the Jurisdiction of that Committee under Clause 1, Rule X.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor