+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5064)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5685.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5064-5066)
- Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-715, Part I.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House