+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On October 31, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-595.
- Signed by President.
On October 23, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 22, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 18, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 18, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 10, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On October 10, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On October 9, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
- Called up by House by Rule.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor