+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 27, 2022 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-280.
- Signed by President.
On December 23, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 20, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7282-7283)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 516.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On July 14, 2022 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6611)
On July 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 348 - 63, 5 Present (Roll no. 358). (text: 07/12/2022 CR H5963)
On July 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 348 - 63, 5 Present (Roll no. 358).
On July 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 12, 2022 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5659.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5962-5963)
- Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor