+ − Actions (10)
On August 17, 1982 in the House:
- Failed to Receive 2/3's Vote to Suspend and Pass by Yea-Nay Vote: 189 - 198 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On August 12, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 453.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 97-733.
On June 23, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 10, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 15, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On March 12, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
On February 24, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor