+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-362.
- Signed by President.
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 17, 2010 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 16, 2010 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On November 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 30, 2010 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 28, 2010 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bilbray objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5606 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Driehaus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On July 28, 2010 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 25, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor