+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-527.
- Signed by President.
On October 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 10, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 4, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 4, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
On October 3, 1984 in the House:
- House Agreed to Conference Report by Voice Vote.
On September 25, 1984 in the House:
- Conference Report 98-1074 Filed in House.
On June 29, 1984 in the House:
- House Agreed to Request for Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Dingell, Waxman, Scheuer, Broyhill, Madigan.
On June 29, 1984 in the Senate:
- House Disagreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On June 28, 1984 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3373 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Hatch. To substitute the Senate bill.
- S.AMDT.3373 Amendment SP 3373 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- Senate insists on its amendments, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Hatch; Weicker; Stafford; Kennedy; Randolph.
On June 13, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
On June 11, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 360 - 33 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On June 6, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 479.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 98-826.
On May 15, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 10, 1984 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 3, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On May 1, 1984 in the House:
- For Previous Action See H.R.5494 .
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3373
To substitute the Senate bill.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor