+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5602.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4583-4589)
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-526, Part I.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4583-4586)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
- Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426.
- Committee on Armed Services discharged.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 2.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (180)
Type:
Primary Sponsor