+ − Actions (18)
On August 12, 1982 in the House:
- Other Measure S.2457 Passed House in Lieu.
- Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 279 - 122 .
- Called up by House as D.C. Business.
- H.AMDT.807 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Recorded Vote: 221 - 181 .
- H.AMDT.807 Amendment Offered by Representative Parris. An amendment to require that at leas 14,300,000 dollars of the funds to be paid to D.C. be used to eliminate any deficits in the D.C. Teachers' Retirement Fund and the D.C. Police Officers and Fire Fighters' Retirement Fund.
On August 9, 1982 in the House:
- Considered by House Bill Withdrawn from Consideration.
- Measure Considered in House as in the Committee of the Whole.
- Called up by House as D.C. Business.
On May 24, 1982 in the House:
- Supplemental Report Filed by House Committee on District of Columbia. House Report No: 97-512 .
On May 13, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 307.
- Reported to House by House Committee on District of Columbia. Report No: 97-512.
On May 12, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 2, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fiscal Affairs and Health.
On February 24, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on District of Columbia.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.807
An amendment to require that at leas 14,300,000 dollars of the funds to be paid to D.C. be used to eliminate any deficits in the D.C. Teachers' Retirement Fund and the D.C. Police Officers and Fire Fighters' Retirement Fund.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor