+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 9, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5593 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Lofgren, Zoe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 443.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 110-700 .
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor