+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 86.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-68.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H716)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 558.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H716-717)
- Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor