+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 6, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5069-5070)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5577.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5069-5070)
- Mr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 552.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-713.
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
On July 6, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House