+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On June 21, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 424 - 3 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5573 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Deal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 20, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 285.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 109-509 .
On June 15, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 12, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor