+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On November 5, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-601.
- Signed by President.
On October 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 26, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 18, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 18, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 1, 1986 in the Senate:
- Held at the desk by unanimous consent. Pending further disposition.
On September 30, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 29, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 277 - 112 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 19, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor