+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 1982 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.5252 .
On March 24, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 23, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 17, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 16, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 15, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 11, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 10, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 9, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 4, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 2, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 25, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 23, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On February 22, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor