+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 31, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-190.
- Signed by President.
On December 19, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 18, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 18, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 17, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 17, 1975 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On December 15, 1975 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report.
On December 12, 1975 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-724.
On November 6, 1975 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On October 30, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 1259 , roll call #462 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On September 17, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Government Operations .
On May 22, 1975 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Senate Committee on Government Operations.
- Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs discharged in Senate.
On April 24, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
On April 22, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #133 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On April 18, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Small Business, H. Rept. 94-154.
On March 26, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Small Business.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor