+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 570.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-687, Part I.
On July 15, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On December 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (114)
Type:
Primary Sponsor