+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 11, 1984 in the House:
- House Incorporated this Measure in S.2614 as an Amendment.
- Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 5, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 559.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-991.
On August 24, 1984 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On August 1, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 26, 1984 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On April 25, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor