+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 2 of H. Res. 1464, and the motion offered by Mr. Carter (LA), the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4275, as amended; H.R. 5502, as amended; H.R. 5721, as amended; H.R. 6290, as amended; H.R. 7277, as amended; H.R. 7299, as amended; and H.R. 8416, as amended. (consideration: CR H8566-8574; text: CR H8567-8568)
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On November 17, 2022 in the House:
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, proceedings on H.R. 5502 are considered vacated.
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 2 of H. Res. 1464, and the motion offered by Mr. Carter (LA), the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4275, as amended; H.R. 5502, as amended; H.R. 5721, as amended; H.R. 6290, as amended; H.R. 7277, as amended; H.R. 7299, as amended; and H.R. 8416, as amended.
On November 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-555.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399.
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8477-8480; text: CR H8477-8478)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5502.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On November 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On November 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce Discharged.
On October 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor