+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 26, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-345.
- Signed by President.
On August 24, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 12, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 12, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 5, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 597.
On August 3, 1992 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Mr. Oberstar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House resumed debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 21, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 372.
- Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 102-671.
On July 1, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On June 25, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On June 24, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
On March 26, 1992 in the House:
- Hearings Held by Subcommittee on Aviation Prior to Referral .
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor