+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 6, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On August 4, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays : 278 - 131 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On August 3, 1992 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Aug. 4.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hughes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-775.
On July 22, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On June 24, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor