+ − Summary
+ − Actions (37)
On November 15, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On November 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Oceanography.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, Interior, EPA.
On October 17, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Research and Development.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On October 15, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Development Institutions and Finance.
On October 14, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Aviation and Materials.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Science, Research and Technology.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
On October 5, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor