+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 414 - 0 (Roll no. 146). (text: CR H3411-3416)
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 831. (consideration: CR H3411-3422)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, the text of H.R. 2901, H.R. 5437, H.R. 5438, H.R. 5439, H.R. 5440, H.R. 5443, H.R. 5445, and H.R. 5446, all as passed by the House, were appended to the end of the engrossment of H.R. 5444 as new matter.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3429)
- Rule provides for consideration of both H.R. 5444 and H.R. 5445 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Ways and Means for each measure. Rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5444, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Jenkins (KS) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage of H.R. 5444 until later in the legislative day.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5444.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 831 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5444 and H.R. 5445. Rule provides for consideration of both H.R. 5444 and H.R. 5445 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Ways and Means for each measure. Rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 488.
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-637, Part I.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
H.Amdt.543
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (5)
Lynn Jenkins
Type:
Primary Sponsor