+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On November 14, 2022 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8473-8477)
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-553.
On November 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 14, 2022 in the House:
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 397.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5441.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8490-8491)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 304 - 111 (Roll no. 478).
On November 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 304 - 111 (Roll no. 478). (text: CR H8473-8474)
On September 21, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 9.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 0 .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (261)
Type:
Primary Sponsor