+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On March 3, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On February 16, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On February 11, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Policy, Trade and Environment.
On February 4, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
On January 21, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor