+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 1, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529.
On June 29, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays : 350 - 8 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Rostenkowski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 26, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 102-621.
On June 24, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On June 18, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor