+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 702.
On October 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On October 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 7, 2002 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5427 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 20, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On September 19, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor