+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-547.
- Signed by President.
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 12, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 11, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1128.
On October 6, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 5, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-1057 .
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-1057 .
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 624.
On September 29, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 28, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 27, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor