+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On August 1, 1984 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- See H.R.4170 .
On April 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 799. By unanimous consent.
On April 12, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 261 - 152 .
- Called up by House by Rule.
- Rule Passed House.
- H.AMDT.679 Amendment Failed of Passage in Committee of Whole by Voice Vote.
- H.AMDT.679 Amendment Offered by Representative Jacobs. An amendment imposing a one year freeze on the amounts which Medicare will pay for physicians' services to hospital patients setting the limit at the fees as of June 30, 1984. These fees are to be considered as having provided full coverage for the services provided. Hospitals cannot qualify for the Medicare program if they do not agree to these requirements.
On April 10, 1984 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.483 Reported to House.
- Rule Granted Providing a Closed Rule with 6 Hours of Debate. Waiver of Points of Order.
On April 9, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Small Business.
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.679
An amendment imposing a one year freeze on the amounts which Medicare will pay for physicians' services to hospital patients setting the limit at the fees as of June 30, 1984. These fees are to be considered as having provided full coverage for the services provided. Hospitals cannot qualify for the Medicare program if they do not agree to these requirements.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor