+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-241. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On September 6, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6032)
On July 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On July 23, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6600)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5385.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6600-6602)
- Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (76)
Gene Green
Type:
Primary Sponsor