+ − Summary
+ − Actions (28)
On November 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
On October 24, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On October 15, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Development Institutions and Finance.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
On October 14, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and Agriculture.
On October 11, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
On October 6, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation.
On October 3, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOE.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Research and Development.
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Scientific Cooperation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Science, Research and Technology.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agricultural Research, and Environment.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development.
On September 26, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Small Business.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor