+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401.
- Committee on Education and Labor discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-500, Part I.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor