+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4998)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5373.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4998-4999)
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 448.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-548.
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House