+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 115-135. (TXT | PDF)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1290-1291)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 310.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H57)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H57-59)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 535.
- Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (81)
Type:
Primary Sponsor