+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 3, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 534 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Bono moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 13, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 13, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor