+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- For Further Action See S.2057 .
On September 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On September 26, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 22, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 20, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor