+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 10, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-227.
- Signed by President.
On January 31, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On January 30, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On January 30, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On January 24, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On January 24, 1978 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On December 15, 1977 in the Senate:
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On November 2, 1977 in the Senate:
- Text as reported by Senate inserted in H. R. 9346 .
On November 1, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance with amendment, S. Rept. 95-572.
On July 20, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On July 18, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On June 16, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 95-438.
On March 22, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor