+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On December 1, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-650.
- Signed by President.
On November 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 28, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
On October 27, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2648 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2648 amended.
- Mr. Brooks moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Mr. Fish demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules. Without objection a second was ordered.
On October 27, 1990 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
On October 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 907.
On September 27, 1990 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Brooks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Mr. Moorhead demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays : 387 - 18 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 21, 1990 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 458.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 101-733.
On September 18, 1990 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 12, 1990 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from Justice.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On July 30, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 27, 1990 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Justice.
On July 26, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law.
On July 19, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor