+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 13, 2022 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7750-7752)
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-460.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357.
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 13, 2022 in the House:
- Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5315.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7778-7779)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 308 - 110 (Roll no. 422).
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 308 - 110 (Roll no. 422). (text: CR H7750)
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 4.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On September 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor