+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On July 20, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
On July 8, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On June 26, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On June 19, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Justice, DOT, Treasury.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
On June 17, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Investigations.
On June 15, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice.
On June 3, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence .
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor